ST ALBANS CITY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1089343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 07 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 May 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 15 May 2019 15 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 30 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 March 2017 On time Download