HONEYWELL SCHOOLS, PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1087950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £80.72k £125.49k £87.91k £172.43k £83.15k
Total expenditure £67.97k £101.07k £94.97k £104.73k £94.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A