SAXMUNDHAM MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a public museum in Saxmundham for the preservation and exhibition of items of historic value illustrative of the character and history of the area and the acquisition of suitable regional material and its proper conservation for the purposes of education, preservation, display and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 December 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Minta | Chair | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Donna Mary Foster | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Gale | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HENRY IAN WILLS CRISP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.98k | £17.41k | £6.06k | £9.14k | £6.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.11k | £7.16k | £11.42k | £10.45k | £9.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC MUSEUM IN SAXMUNDHAM, IN THE SUFFOLK COASTAL AREA, FOR THE PRESERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF ITEMS OF HISTORICAL VALUE ILLUSTRATIVE OF THE CHARACTER AND HISTORY OF THE SAID AREA; AND (2) THE ACQUISITION OF SUITABLE REGIONAL MATERIAL AND ITS PROPER CONSERVATION FOR THE PURPOSES OF EDUCATION, PRESERVATION, DISPLAY AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK COASTAL AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 South Entrance
Saxmundham
IP17 1DQ
- Phone:
- 07968711135
- Email:
- Saxmuseum@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window