LONDON CITIZENS

Charity number: 1088174
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 July 2019 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required