Financial history TRELYA

Charity number: 1089634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £486.80k £377.05k £567.02k £634.20k £733.49k
Total expenditure £676.11k £451.30k £492.19k £487.89k £624.15k
Income from government contracts £94.56k £48.97k N/A £23.84k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £8.76k N/A £6.96k £189.28k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £19.22k £77 £98.10k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £73.95k £80.67k £28.81k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £473.85k £553.34k £606.55k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £2 £113 £34
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £492.19k £487.89k £624.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £54.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0