Financial history SPREAD THE WORD

Charity number: 1088890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £310.18k £355.22k £427.68k £362.66k £420.63k
Total expenditure £260.04k £357.03k £409.72k £320.99k £327.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £999