OMAID FOUNDATION (OF.UK)

Charity number: 1094069
Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Annual return 07 August 2019 13 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2018 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2017 21 October 2018 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2016 13 July 2017 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2016 Not Required