OMAID FOUNDATION (OF.UK)

Charity number: 1094069
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 07/08/2015 07/08/2016 07/08/2017 07/08/2018 07/08/2019
Total gross income £50 £1.00k £100 £100 £500
Total expenditure £50 £1.00k £100 £100 £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A