Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM BLAKE HOUSE NORTHANTS

Charity number: 1089471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window