Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF BERRY POMEROY CHURCH

Charity number: 1089479
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window