Financial history THE FRIENDS OF BERRY POMEROY CHURCH

Charity number: 1089479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.24k £21.14k £37.23k £3.94k £5.11k
Total expenditure £550 £21 £2.00k £3.13k £3.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A