IVY STREET FAMILY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1088854
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £35.03k £41.16k £81.58k £52.46k £42.09k
Total expenditure £42.25k £56.80k £59.60k £76.08k £62.03k