MYANMAR / BURMA RELIEF AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1093724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 April 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 April 2021 446 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required