Accounts and annual returns ST GERMANS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1090448
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required