Financial history ST GERMANS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1090448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.69k £2.60k £9.52k £3.64k £1.34k
Total expenditure £7.07k £60 £6.47k £7.56k £3.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A