HELMSLEY ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1089682
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.36k £1.96k £1.12k £1.16k £590
Total expenditure £809 £1.61k £615 £803 £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A