Trustees PURSUING INDEPENDENT PATHS

Charity number: 1088592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN STUART LLEWELYN LEACH Chair 19 February 2014
READY 4 SCHOOL RWANDA
Received: On time
Patrick Brown Trustee 29 May 2023
None on record
Theresa Chidimma Ekendu Trustee 29 May 2023
None on record
Terri Cash Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Tilly Lang Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Mark George Barrie Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
Judith Anne Wilcox Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
DANIEL JAMES WAKERLEY Trustee 19 September 2018
None on record