ERIC WILTON SIMPSON'S GIFT TO THE GOVERNORS OF LADY MANNERS' SCHOOL, BAKEWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ERIC WILTON SIMPSON'S GIFT TO THE GOVERNORS OF LADY MANNERS SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 September 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Chasca Twyman | Chair | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Peat | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £461 | £370 | £360 | £302 | £451 | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £209 | £225 | £396 | £223 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 20 AUGUST 1997 AND AN ORDER OF THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE CHANCERY DIVISION DATED 27 MARCH 2000 AND SCHEME DATED 21 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE SAID SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHUTTS LANE
BAKEWELL
DERBYSHIRE
DE45 1JA
- Phone:
- 01629812671
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window