Accounts and annual returns INDIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1094366
Charity reporting is overdue by 1312 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 216 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 216 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 581 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 581 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 946 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 946 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1312 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1312 days
Annual return 30 April 2017 15 March 2021 1111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 15 March 2021 1111 days late Download Open in new window