Financial history INDIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1094366
Charity reporting is overdue by 1315 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £30.86k £30.32k £42.24k £60.70k £65.84k
Total expenditure £23.90k £29.23k £30.61k £64.26k £83.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0