2ND ST CLEARS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1088869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.60k £9.88k £9.35k £9.71k £25.82k
Total expenditure £10.32k £7.57k £11.57k £10.66k £19.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £20.25k