IPSWICH SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education by paying or applying the whole of the annual income and the capital of the trust fund for the benefit of educational charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 12 December 2002: Standard registration
- IPSWICH SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Wilson | Chair | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas George Barber | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Emily Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Harsant | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
EAMON JOHN MULHOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.17k | £13.94k | £10.95k | £14.81k | £11.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.17k | £13.94k | £10.95k | £14.81k | £11.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 August 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 August 2022 | 427 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 August 2022 | 427 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28/01/1970 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/09/2012 as amended on 08 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
The Trustees shall hold the Trust Fund and the income thereof UPON TRUST for the advancement of education by paying or applying the whole or part of: (A) the annual income of the Trust Fund; and/or (B) the capital of the Trust Fund to or towards or in furtherance or for the benefit of Ipswich School. “Ipswich School” means the charitable trust registered with the Charity Commission for England and Wales with registered charity number 310493 and governed by a Charity Commission Scheme dated 14 November 1991 as amended by a Resolution dated 3 July 2015 and by a Resolution and Scheme both dated 5 September 2022.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
IPSWICH SCHOOL
25 HENLEY ROAD
IPSWICH
IP1 3SG
- Phone:
- 01473408300
- Email:
- jmh@ipswich.school
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window