Financial history ST GEORGE'S LUPSET LTD

Charity number: 1094331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £1.18m £1.17m £1.21m £1.40m £1.52m
Total expenditure £1.22m £1.21m £1.27m £1.36m £1.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £454.92k £449.71k £219.01k
Income from government grants N/A £523.56k £104.21k £200.65k £161.27k
Income - Donations and legacies £100.95k £127.20k £223.73k £431.84k £525.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £824 £0 £0 £512
Income - Charitable activities £927.22k £902.37k £756.92k £872.88k £888.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £70.38k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £85.16k £143.45k £226.26k £95.65k £108.17k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.21m £1.08m £1.36m £1.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £281 £262 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.44k £8.02k £5.74k £5.78k £6.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £196.67k £0 £0