STRATFORD-UPON-AVON TOWN TRUST

Charity number: 1088521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew John Macdonald Trustee 24 January 2018 None on record
TONY JACKSON Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
Quentin Willson Chair 21 May 2015
THE FRIENDS OF SHAKESPEARE'S CHURCH Received: On time
Elizabeth Coles Trustee 01 June 2020
MUNICIPAL CHARITIES Received: On time
DAVID TAYLOR Trustee 04 July 2018 None on record
Gillian Hazel Cleeve Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
STEPHEN PARKER Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
TIMOTHY BAILEY Trustee 04 July 2018 None on record
CLIVE SNOWDON Trustee 01 February 2015 None on record
Josephine Stevens Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR LINDSAY MACDONALD Trustee 04 July 2018 None on record