DIAL PETERBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DIAL Peterborough offers a free and confidential supportive service for anyone with a physical disability living in the Peterborough area. We support people in securing their rights and help to challenge cases of discrimination. We are a user led organisation and we encourage disabled people to become involved at all levels of our organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 07 November 2001: Standard registration
- DISABILITY PETERBOROUGH (Working name)
- DISABLEMENT INFORMATION AND ADVICE LINE (Working name)
- DIAL PETERBOROUGH LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Watling | Chair | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR JOHN DUNHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES OLIVER HOPGOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
NICKY HAMPSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.24k | £285.92k | £188.48k | £197.61k | £286.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.21k | £276.21k | £207.80k | £251.53k | £228.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £78.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH JULY 2001
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES LIVING IN GREATER PETERBOROUGH SO THAT THEY MAY LEAD ACTIVE AND FULFILLING LIVES INTEGRATED IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
GREATER PETERBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Italian Community Association
Fleet Way
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 8DL
- Phone:
- 01733265551
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window