Accounts and annual returns TRIBOS WORLD MOVEMENT FOR RECONCILIATION

Charity number: 1112530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 January 2020 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required