Financial history TRIBOS WORLD MOVEMENT FOR RECONCILIATION

Charity number: 1112530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £51 £53 £60 £55 £13
Total expenditure £250 £203 £203 £233 £239
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A