Accounts and annual returns TRUST FOR THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS BRODSWORTH

Charity number: 1088780
Charity reporting is overdue by 1725 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 264 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 264 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 629 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 629 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 994 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 994 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1359 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1359 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1725 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1725 days