Financial history TRUST FOR THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS BRODSWORTH

Charity number: 1088780
Charity reporting is overdue by 1723 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £3.08k £4.08k £3.98k £986 £7.48k
Total expenditure £3.08k £4.08k £0 £0 £12.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A