Trustees PUDDLEDUCKS PRE-SCHOOL (WORKSOP)
Charity number: 1090438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Nelson | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Beardsley | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Matthews | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Wilson | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hull | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Reading | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Hull | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Reading | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Pemberton | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Hough | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.