THE FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH CHARLESTOWN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund Raising/Social events. (ie; car boot sales, flower festival, Talk and Supper evenings, Treasure Hunt, etc.). Raising funds to ensure the future of the buildings and grounds etc of St. Paul's Church, Charlestown.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 11 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH MINORS | Chair | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Mary Fisher | Trustee | 31 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET STEPHNIE ALLANAH MASSEY | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE CARR BRISTOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL CHARLES ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.09k | £19.89k | £9.40k | £10.28k | £4.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.40k | £2.56k | £2.21k | £3.00k | £65.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 April 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 08 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MAINTAINING, REPAIRING, RESTORING, PRESERVING, IMPROVING, BEAUTIFYING AND RECONSTRUCTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST PAUL'S CHARLESTOWN, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD.
Area of benefit
THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST PAUL'S CHARLESTOWN AND ITS CHURCHYARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Pellymounter Road
ST. AUSTELL
Cornwall
PL25 4PX
- Phone:
- 0172663541
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window