CAMBRIDGE JEWISH CHAPLAINCY BOARD

Charity number: 1089484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 January 2020 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required