Financial history CAMBRIDGE JEWISH CHAPLAINCY BOARD

Charity number: 1089484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £14.02k £9.98k £10.17k £8.40k £10.30k
Total expenditure £14.03k £9.11k £15.20k £4.36k £4.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A