CAMBRIDGE JEWISH CHAPLAINCY BOARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing the activities of the Chaplains for the Jewish Students of East Anglia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR DAVID ABULAFIA | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Sarah Schechter | Trustee | 28 February 2016 |
|
|||||||||
BARRY LANDY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.40k | £10.30k | £7.70k | £7.02k | £5.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £4.55k | £3.72k | £4.24k | £4.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED 20TH NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH FAITH AMONGST JEWISH STUDENTS AT UNIVERSITIES, POLYTECHNICS AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION WITHIN EAST ANGLIA IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE APPOINTMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF CHAPLAINS AND ASSISTANT CHAPLAINS TO SERVE AT SUCH INSTITUTIONS AND TO SUPPORT THE SPIRITUAL EDUCATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE NEEDS OF JEWISH STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
WITHIN EAST ANGLIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
192 GILBERT ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 3PB
- Phone:
- 01223570417
- Email:
- barrylandy@cantab.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window