Trustees PARTNERSHIP FOR CHILDREN
Charity number: 1089810

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Spicer | Chair | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Prina Mukeshkumar Patel | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Mairi Derrick | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Woolf | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeppe Kristen Toft | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Verity Linnell | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Davide Antognazza | Trustee | 14 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Novak | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Hendrick Marais | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Juliana Fleury | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.