THE SEQUOIA TRUST

Charity number: 1090926
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2011 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £2.27m £1.11m £11.27k £21.27m £26.38m
Total expenditure £1.86m £1.13m £561.47k £2.01m £36.96m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £2.27m £1.11m N/A £21.27m £23.12m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.03k £2.12k N/A £1.12k £8.36k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.86m £1.13m N/A £2.01m £36.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.61k £4.11k N/A £3.81k £10.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.86m £1.13m N/A £2.01m £36.95m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0