ALMA ROYALTON-KISCH TRUST

Charity number: 1088663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 March 2019 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 March 2019 56 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required