Accounts and annual returns 2K PLUS INTERNATIONAL SPORTS MEDIA

Charity number: 1091941
Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 134 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 134 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window