LONDON LINGALA NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1089982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.55k £3.14k £3.86k £2.52k £2.66k
Total expenditure £3.98k £3.19k £3.78k £1.52k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A