Accounts and annual returns PARAYHOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1090757
Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 40 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 40 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 August 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 August 2021 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 July 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window