Financial history PARAYHOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1090757
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.45m £1.38m £1.42m £1.69m £1.72m
Total expenditure £1.32m £1.28m £1.30m £1.45m £1.31m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £425.17k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £449.49k £451.22k £39.39k £520.19k £698.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £449.59k £468.33k £476.87k £534.25k £704.52k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.00m £870.87k £916.38k £1.12m £972.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £773 £20.33k £985 £2.65k £3.00k
Income - Other £0 £23.15k £24.69k £27.89k £37.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.31m £1.28m £1.30m £1.45m £867.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £641 £991 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.40k £81.63k £80.45k £0 £149.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £8.40k £0 £0 £0 £446.34k