Trustees PARAYHOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1090757
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Daniela Schwartz Chair 02 July 2014
None on record
Georgina Klein Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Thomas Cowley Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Beatriz Exposito Trustee 26 November 2019
None on record
Michael Gallagher Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
Hala Elansari Trustee 20 November 2018
None on record
STEVEN PALMER HUSSEY Trustee 27 June 2017
None on record
Johnnie Wraith Trustee 01 December 2014
None on record