KABER VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kaber Village Hall Trust is a Charity run by locals of Kaber and Heggerscale Parish undertaking many community social & fundraising events through out the year. These include village shows, coffee mornings with children's activities, domino drives,heritage day, BBQ's and seasonal events. The charity aims to use the village hall and its facilities to support & promote the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 04 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH LOUISE LOFTHOUSE | Chair | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN LOUISE DUCKETT | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LANE | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £10.30k | £17.94k | £3.62k | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £842 | £1.41k | £937 | £1.87k | £6.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 January 2022 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KABER IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA ( HEREINAFTER CALLED " THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF KABER IN THE COUNTRY OF CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stowgill
Kaber
KIRKBY STEPHEN
Cumbria
CA17 4HZ
- Phone:
- 01768371798
- Email:
- chair@kabervh.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window