THE FELL PONY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1104945
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EILEEN AUDREY WALKER Trustee 18 August 2011 None on record
CHRISTINE HEATHER ROBINSON Trustee None on record
DIANA JUDITH SLACK Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Alison Wales Bell Trustee 28 March 2015 None on record
ANDREW THORPE Trustee None on record
CHRISTINE SUSAN MILLARD Trustee 18 August 2011 None on record
GLENIS MARGARET COCKBAIN Trustee None on record
CLAIRE EVELYN SIMPSON Trustee 29 March 2014 None on record
JANE LOUISE RAWDEN Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Ruth Mary Eastwood Trustee 07 April 2018 None on record
PAUL METCALFE Trustee None on record
COLIN CHARLES ROBERTS Trustee None on record
GEORGE HENRY BARRY MALLINSON Trustee None on record
PETER BOUSTEAD Chair None on record
DAVID WILKINSON Trustee None on record
Rachael Jane Brunskill Trustee 02 April 2016 None on record
Michael Richard Goddard Trustee 28 March 2015 None on record
SARAH ANNE CHARLTON Trustee None on record
John Potter Trustee 02 April 2016 None on record
WILLIAM POTTER Trustee None on record