HOMELESS LINK

Charity number: 1089173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.44m £4.84m £6.10m £9.22m £21.79m
Total expenditure £4.33m £4.98m £5.86m £9.05m £21.65m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.32m £1.34m £1.26m £2.48m £10.63m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £99.86k £227.73k £322.24k £315.28k
Income - Other trading activities £1.56m £1.73m £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.79m £2.91m £5.84m £8.81m £21.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.86k £26.46k £23.68k £19.71k £0
Income - Other £83.40k £74.89k £0 £64.63k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.30m £4.96m £5.84m £9.03m £21.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.35k £15.29k £13.17k £13.17k £26.63k
Expenditure - Governance £63.40k £48.05k £28.44k £33.94k £46.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £2.54m £15.34m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0