HOMELESS LINK

Charity number: 1089173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Lennox Trustee 26 July 2017 None on record
AMANDA DUBARRY Trustee 17 May 2017 None on record
Jamie Whysall Trustee 15 February 2017 None on record
Eleanor McNeil Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
Harish Sumanlal BHAYANI Trustee 19 October 2017 None on record
Maria Iglesias Trustee 09 December 2020 None on record
Steven Benson Trustee 17 May 2017
THE SOCIETY OF ST DISMAS LIMITED Received: On time
Michael Patrick EGAN Trustee 19 October 2017 None on record
Mark Simms Trustee 23 October 2018
AMBER VALLEY ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH LTD Received: On time
THE ACADEMY OF YOUTH LIMITED Received: On time
PIERS FEILDEN Chair 22 July 2015
THE HENRY SMITH CHARITY Received: On time
Jeff Marsh Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
David Smith Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record