THE EXETER & DISTRICT CLASSICAL MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1090945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £46.65k £47.76k £51.04k £59.08k £52.33k
Total expenditure £43.50k £55.55k £42.21k £53.08k £41.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A