ASHFIELD VOLUNTARY ACTION

Charity number: 1089635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 March 2018 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 March 2018 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time Download