ASHFIELD VOLUNTARY ACTION

Charity number: 1089635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £113.78k £236.71k £208.49k £154.20k £178.02k
Total expenditure £178.71k £199.89k £173.78k £152.82k £141.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £107.95k N/A £83.71k £7.00k
Income from government grants £25.47k £25.33k £15.70k N/A £500