Accounts and annual returns DEAFWAY

Charity number: 1089918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window